EP2990333 - ROTOR BLADE COUPLING DEVICE OF A ROTOR HEAD FOR A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marenco Swisshelicopter AG Dorfstrasse 57 8330 Pfäffikon / CH | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stucki, Martin Dorfstrasse 57 8330 Pfäffikon / CH | 02 /
Caminada, Mario Stückliweg 1A 7206 Igis / CH | 03 /
Moser, Patrick Reginald Mühlebachstrasse 8b 8810 Horgen / CH | 04 /
Leibbrandt, Riekert 1212 Storey Street Queenswood, Pretoria 0186 / ZA | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 15180913.4 | 13.08.2015 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | CH20140001291 | 27.08.2014 Original published format: CH 12912014 | CH20150001103 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: CH 11032015 | [2016/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2990333 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/35, B64C27/51 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
B64C27/35 (EP,US);
B64C27/48 (US);
B64C27/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORBLATTKOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES ROTORKOPFS FÜR EINEN DREHFLÜGLER | [2016/09] | English: | ROTOR BLADE COUPLING DEVICE OF A ROTOR HEAD FOR A ROTARY WING AIRCRAFT | [2016/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE DE PALE DE ROTOR D'UNE TETE DE ROTOR POUR UN GIRAVION | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 07.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3302726 (STANLEY PAUL H) [A] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [AD]US2008159862 (BEROUL FREDERIC [FR]) [AD] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2514670 (EUROCOPTER FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,4 * | by applicant | US2008159862 |