EP2995912 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD, CONTROL SYSTEM AND SPRAYER VEHICLE WITH SUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanson, David A 2803 148th Street Urbandale, IA 50323 / US | 02 /
Hitchler, Bradley J 5508 N 75th Ave W Baxter, IA 50028 / US | 03 /
Humpal, Richard A 3268 NW 89th Ave Ankeny, IA 50021 / US | 04 /
Martin, Matthew T 477 Lory Ln. Grovetown, GA 30813 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 15181907.5 | 21.08.2015 | [2016/11] | Priority number, date | US201414485052 | 12.09.2014 Original published format: US201414485052 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2995912 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/00, A01M7/00, A01C23/00, // B05B12/08 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A01M7/0085 (EP,US);
B05B12/08 (US);
A01C23/007 (EP,US);
A01M7/0089 (EP,US);
G01B21/22 (US);
G01F23/20 (EP,US);
G01F23/68 (EP,US);
G01F23/804 (EP,US);
A61B5/1073 (US);
G01F17/00 (US);
G01F22/02 (US);
G01F23/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2016/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN, STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND SPRÜHFAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2016/11] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD, CONTROL SYSTEM AND SPRAYER VEHICLE WITH SUCH | [2016/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ASSISTÉ PAR ORDINATEUR, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET VÉHICULE COMPORTANT UN TEL PULVÉRISATEUR | [2016/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 17.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5072615 (NAWROCKI RYSZARD [US]) [A] 1-11* figures 1, 5 *; | [XI]WO2006032309 (TECOMEC S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11 * figures 1, 2 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 16 * * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 6, line 17 - line 19 * [I] 5-8; | [A]US2008314674 (KAMIO KUNIHIKO [JP]) [A] 5-7 * paragraphs [0067] , [0 68] *; | [A]US2011010070 (BOHR SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 5-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 23] , [0 29] , [0 34] *; | [X]US2014183276 (KROESE GLEN D [US]) [X] 1,4,9-11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1, 2 * |