EP2993911 - METHOD AND CLIENT TERMINAL FOR RECEIVING A MULTIMEDIA CONTENT SPLIT INTO AT LEAST TWO SUCCESSIVE SEGMENTS, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUDAILLE, Rémi c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
GOUACHE, Stéphane c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Morain, David Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 15182165.9 | 24.08.2015 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | EP20140306362 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14306362 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993911 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/845, H04N21/854, H04N21/442, H04N21/24, H04N21/44, H04N21/2343, H04L29/06 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L43/0894 (US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/762 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04N21/2385 (CN);
H04N21/2401 (EP,US);
H04N21/26216 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2016/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND CLIENT-TERMINAL ZUM EMPFANG VON MULTIMEDIAINHALTEN, DIE IN MINDESTENS ZWEI AUFEINANDERFOLGENDE SEGMENTE GETEILT SIND, SOWIE EIN ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMMERZEUGNIS UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2016/10] | English: | METHOD AND CLIENT TERMINAL FOR RECEIVING A MULTIMEDIA CONTENT SPLIT INTO AT LEAST TWO SUCCESSIVE SEGMENTS, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2016/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL CLIENT PERMETTANT DE RECEVOIR UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA DIVISÉ EN AU MOINS DEUX SEGMENTS SUCCESSIFS ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANTS | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2362651 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0057] *; | [A]EP2410743 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [A]WO2013089437 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [I]WO2014057896 (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1-15 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 37 - line 39 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 1 - line 4 * * page 8, line 24 - line 42 * * page 9, line 39 - line 44 * * page 10, line 1 - line 5 * * page 11, line 33 - line 37 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 5 * * page 15, line 27 - line 33 * * page 16, line 11 - line 14 * * page 19, line 25 - line 27 *; | [A]US2014241415 (SU YEPING [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] *; | EP2793479 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0014] *; | [P]EP2908535 (SHARP KK [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0086] *; | [A] - KRISTIAN EVENSEN ET AL, "Improving the performance of quality-adaptive video streaming over multiple heterogeneous access networks", MMSYS '11 PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND ANNUAL ACM CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS, New York, NY, USA, (20110223), vol. 25, doi:10.1145/1943552.1943560, ISBN 978-1-45-030518-1, page 57, XP055106209 [A] 1-15 * sections 3.2.1-3.2.2 * * section 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1943552.1943560 | [A] - CHENGHAO LIU ET AL, "Segment duration for rate adaptation of adaptive HTTP streaming", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO (ICME), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110711), doi:10.1109/ICME.2011.6012094, ISBN 978-1-61284-348-3, pages 1 - 4, XP031964772 [A] 1-15 * page 1, column right, line 26 - line 28 * * page 2, column right, line 11 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2011.6012094 |