EP3006957 - OPTOELECTRONIC DETECTION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DETECTION DEVICE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING SUCH A DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Felix Laiernstr. 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Kluth, Philipp, et al Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH CDA-IP Laiernstraße 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15183717.6 | 03.09.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | DE201410114723 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014114723 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006957 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/93, G01S17/42, G01S7/481 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/4815 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP);
G01S2013/93276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHE DETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLCHEN DETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER SOLCHEN DETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC DETECTION DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DETECTION DEVICE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING SUCH A DETECTION DEVICE | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION OPTOELECTRONIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION ET VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE DOTE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 27.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10016892 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 37 *; | [I]DE10012522 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [I] 1-3 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] - [0013] - [0018] , [0019] , [0026] - [0037] *; | [XI]DE102004062022 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0013] - [0016] - [0020] * [I] 6; | [XI]DE102010054078 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0039] - [0049] * [I] 5-7 | by applicant | DE102010047984 |