EP3024062 - SEPARATOR FOR RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERY AND RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Eon-Mi Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jong-Hwan Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
NAM, Jung-Hyun Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Yeon-Joo Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
SEOK, Hoon Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Goh, Ae-Hui Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu 17084 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 15184079.0 | 07.09.2015 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | KR20140161936 | 19.11.2014 Original published format: KR 20140161936 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024062 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3024062 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42, H01M10/052 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/443 (KR);
H01M10/052 (CN,KR,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M50/414 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/434 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/446 (US);
H01M50/451 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/457 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | H01M2/16, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR EINE WIEDERAUFLADBARE LITHIUMBATTERIE UND WIEDERAUFLADBARE LITHIUMBATTERIE DAMIT | [2016/21] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERY AND RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME | [2016/21] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM ET BATTERIE RACHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM CONTENANT UN TEL SÉPARATEUR | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 10.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2015 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.09.2015 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011111280 (TAMAKOSHI HIROMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0035] *; | [XI]EP2662912 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-13 * claims 1-12 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * examples 1,2 * * figures 1,3,4 * * example 1 * [I] 6-8; | [A]WO2014041983 (JSR CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2779277 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0085] * * claim 14 * * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0138] *; | [AP]EP2838137 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-13 * the whole document * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] ** paragraph [0041] *; | [P]EP2897198 (JSR CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0002]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0182] * * paragraph [0184] * * paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0190] * * paragraph [0192] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0169] * | Examination | US2014050965 |