EP2988124 - SCALABLE AND HIGH THROUGHPUT BIOSENSING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnomics, SA Parque Tecnógico de Cantanhede Núcleo 04, lote 2 3060-197 Cantanhede / PT | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMANO, Jose Antonio Henriques Kuan c/o INESC - ID Rua Alves Redol 9 P-1000-029 Lisbon / PT | 02 /
PIEDADE, Moises Simoes c/o INESC - ID Rua Alves Redol 9 P-1000-029 Lisbon / PT | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Thorniley, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15184108.7 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | PT20130107138 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: PT 10713813 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2988124 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2988124 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2988124 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/74 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/48785 (EP,US);
G01N27/745 (EP,US);
G01R33/0035 (US);
G01R33/1269 (US);
G01R33/0094 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE BIOSENSING-PLATTFORM MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2016/08] | English: | SCALABLE AND HIGH THROUGHPUT BIOSENSING PLATFORM | [2016/08] | French: | PLATE-FORME DE BIODÉTECTION ÉVOLUTIVE À HAUT RENDEMENT | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14780768.9 / EP2929341 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2014 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | IE | 29.08.2017 | LU | 29.08.2017 | MT | 29.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | FR | 19.09.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | DE | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
MT | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 29.08.2017 | ||
LU | 29.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
DE | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008075262 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [A] - LOPES P ET AL, "Measuring and Extraction of Biological Information on New Handheld Biochip-Based Microsystem", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100101), vol. 59, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TIM.2008.2003321, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 56 - 62, XP011280418 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIM.2008.2003321 |