EP3141705 - GAS TURBINE ROTOR COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia Switzerland AG Römerstrasse 36 5401 Baden / CH | [2017/22] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cataldi, Giovanni Werdgartengasse 4 8004 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Corradi, Mauro Winzerstrasse 50 5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
Sistaninia, Meisam Müllermattstrasse 9A 5200 Brugg / CH | 04 /
Schaefer, Martin Steigstrasse 11 5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | 05 /
Herzog, Tobias Bruggerstrasse 65 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Bernotti, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/11] | Application number, filing date | 15184277.0 | 08.09.2015 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3141705 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3141705 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/18, F01D25/14, F01D25/24, F01D25/08, F02C3/04 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
F01D25/08 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/18 (KR);
F01D25/145 (EP,CN,US);
F01D11/18 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/28 (CN);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C7/20 (CN);
F05D2220/32 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/11] | F01D11/18, F01D25/14, F01D25/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2017/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASTURBINENROTORABDECKUNG | [2017/11] | English: | GAS TURBINE ROTOR COVER | [2017/11] | French: | COUVERCLE DE ROTOR DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2017/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2015 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | GB | 08.09.2019 | IE | 08.09.2019 | LU | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.09.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.09.2015 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1367536 (PENNY R N) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 7-12 [I] 2-4; | [A]US4592204 (RICE IVAN G [US]) [A] 1-12* column 10, line 45 - column 11, line 30; figure 5 *; | [XAI]US2013051995 (WIEBE DAVID J [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 37; figures 2,3 * [A] 7-12 [I] 2-4 |