EP2996245 - MULTIBAND DUCKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirsch, James M. c/o Harman International Industries, Inc. 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT Connecticut 06901 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15184641.7 | 10.09.2015 | [2016/11] | Priority number, date | US201414486451 | 15.09.2014 Original published format: US201414486451 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996245 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/32 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H03G3/32 (EP,US);
H03G3/342 (US);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
H03G3/20 (US);
H04R1/1041 (EP,US);
H03G5/165 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2016/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRBANDIGER DUCKER | [2016/11] | English: | MULTIBAND DUCKER | [2016/11] | French: | DUCKER MULTIBANDE | [2016/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2021 | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/10] | 25.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 30.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5228093 (AGNELLO ANTHONY M [US]) [X] 1,6,9-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 42-49 * * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 38 * * column 3, line 58 - column 7, line 13 * * column 7, lines 54-66 * [I] 2-5,7,8; | [XA]WO2014022359 (PERSONICS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0046] , [0063] , [0065] , [0073] *[A] 10-15 |