EP3047791 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | ||
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKE, Sawa c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAKURA, Junya c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Yasunobu c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
NAKAYAMA, Kanako c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Takuji c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/30] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15184743.1 | 10.09.2015 | [2016/30] | Priority number, date | JP20150010250 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015010250 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047791 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3047791 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/021, A61B5/107 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/02108 (EP,US);
A61B5/0004 (US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/0046 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,US);
A61B5/1075 (US);
A61B5/33 (US);
A61B5/6801 (US);
A61B5/7278 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | A61B5/00, A61B5/021, G06F19/00, A61B5/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2016/30] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2016/30] | French: | SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2015 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IE | 10.09.2019 | LU | 10.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.09.2015 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.09.2015 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008249382 (OH HYUN-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,14,15 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0057] * [A] 7,12 [I] 10,13; | [XAI]US2010049059 (HA KIRYONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,13-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 7,12 [I] 2-4,6,8-11; | [A]WO2013001265 (LEMAN MICRO DEVICES UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |