EP3000416 - APPARATUS FOR USE IN ARTHROPLASTY ON A KNEE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINCZEWSKI, Leo, Arieh 286 Pacific Highway Sydney, New South Wales 2065 / AU | 02 /
PARKER, Stephen, John 54 Holt Avenue Mosman, New South Wales 2088 / AU | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 15185348.8 | 09.03.2001 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ06161 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: AU PQ616100 | AU2000PQ08999 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: AU PQ899900 | AU2000PQ09044 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: AU PQ904400 | AU2000PQ09045 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: AU PQ904500 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3000416 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3000416 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/14, A61B17/15, A61B17/56, A61B17/90, A61B17/16, A61F2/38 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61B17/154 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US);
A61B17/1675 (EP,US);
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/157 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN ARTHROPLASTIE AN EINEM KNIEGELENK | [2016/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR USE IN ARTHROPLASTY ON A KNEE JOINT | [2016/13] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS ARTHROPLASTIE D'UNE ARTICULATION DU GENOU | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01911257.2 / EP1263331 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 19.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9110408 (ZIMMER INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5,11-13 *; | [X]FR2776176 (AESCULAP SA [FR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0682916 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * figure 1 *; | [X]US4938762 (WEHRLI ULRICH [CH]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1,2,5-8 * * column 6, line 8 - column 8, line 48 * * claim 20 *; | [X]US5681316 (DEORIO JAMES K [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-4,7 *; | [X]US6024746 (KATZ LAWRENCE [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 45 * * column 22, lines 54-60 *; | [XAI]FR2679766 (SOPHIA MED [FR]) [X] 15,16,19 * figures 1,3,5-8,14,16,17 * [A] 21 [I] 20; | [X]US5669914 (ECKHOFF DONALD G [US]) [X] 15,16 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US5749876 (DUVILLIER ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 15-17 * figures 3,3A-3C * * column 1, line 7 - line 19 * * column 8, line 44 - column 10, line 33 *; | [X]DE29720105U (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 15,16 * figures 1-2 *; | [IA]US5935128 (CARTER PETER R [US], et al) [I] 15-20 * figures 1-3,10-11 * [A] 21 | by applicant | US5171244 | US5520695 |