EP3144543 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A SAFETY VALVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boeijen, Sander Julianastraat 7 5351 AL Berghem / NL | 02 /
Wouters, Pierre Prof. Dr. JE de Quaystraat 4 5531 EB Bladel / NL | 03 /
Swagten, Gerard Munsel 141 5283TS Boxtel / NL | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15185685.3 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144543 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F15B20/00, F15B1/02 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
F15B1/021 (EP,US);
F16K17/22 (US);
B63B35/4413 (US);
E21B19/006 (US);
F15B1/04 (US);
F15B11/08 (US);
F15B13/0401 (US);
F15B20/00 (EP,US);
F15B20/004 (US);
F15B20/005 (US);
F15B20/008 (EP,US);
F15B2201/51 (US);
F15B2211/6309 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6313 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7051 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2017/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SICHEREITSVENTILAGGREGATS | [2017/12] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A SAFETY VALVE ARRANGEMENT | [2017/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE POUR CONTROLLER UN ARRANGEMENT DE VANNE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4759256 (KOVIT SHELDON L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,13-15 * column 7, line 15 - column 9, line 45 *; | [X]US2004061088 (CLEEREMAN DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11,13-15* paragraphs [0008] , [0016] - [0018] *; | [X]JP2008138716 (KITZ CORP) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP2525104 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0058] *; | [X]EP2881595 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] *; | [X] - LAFAVE C ET AL, "DRILLING RIGS STAND UP TO THE POWER OF THE OCEAN", MOTION SYSTEM - HYDRAULICS & PNEUMATICS, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (20040601), vol. 57, no. 6, ISSN 1543-6470, pages 26 - 29, XP001196389 [X] 1-15 * pages 28-29; figure 3 * | by applicant | EP1302256 | DE102011116328 |