EP2988127 - MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR BIOSENSOR CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHINO, Moriyasu c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
HOSOYA, Toshifumi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 03 /
KAIMORI, Shingo c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 04 /
KITAMURA, Takahiko c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
ICHINO, Moriyasu c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | ||
02 /
HOSOYA, Toshifumi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | |||
03 /
KAIMORI, Shingo c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | |||
04 /
KITAMURA, Takahiko c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15186565.6 | 27.02.2007 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | JP20060050607 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006050607 | JP20060050608 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006050608 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988127 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2988127 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, // G01N27/327 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/48785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | MESSINSTRUMENT FÜR BIOSENSORCHIP | [2016/08] | English: | MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR BIOSENSOR CHIP | [2016/08] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MESURE POUR PUCE DE BIOCAPTEUR | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 16.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07715013.4 / EP1990634 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2007 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | IE | 27.02.2018 | LU | 27.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.02.2007 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003150724 (KAWANAKA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0141] - [0148] - [ 152] , [ 153] *; | [A]US2004244151 (SAKATA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0114] - [0117] *; | [A]US4999582 (PARKS ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, lines 28-38, 42-54 * | by applicant | JPH11108879 | JPH08504953 | JP2002257782 |