EP3148186 - VIRTUAL WINDOWS FOR AIRBORNE VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedel, Christian c/o Airbus Operations GmbH, Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15186718.1 | 24.09.2015 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148186 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, B64D11/00 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/698 (CN,US);
B64D11/00 (EP,US);
B64D47/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/1431 (US);
G06F3/1446 (US);
H04N23/63 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/69 (CN);
H04N5/2624 (CN);
H04N5/265 (CN,US);
H04N7/015 (US);
H04N7/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIRTUELLES FENSTER FÜR LUFTFAHRZEUGE | [2017/13] | English: | VIRTUAL WINDOWS FOR AIRBORNE VEHICLES | [2017/13] | French: | FENÊTRES VIRTUELLES POUR DES VÉHICULES AÉROPORTÉS | [2017/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/11] | 14.03.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/11] | Appeal following examination | 14.05.2019 | Appeal received No. T2072/19 | 12.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.12.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 01.02.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US2004217976 (SANFORD WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US2009195652 (GAL EHUD [IL]); | [Y]US2010188506 (DWYER MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [AD]US2013169807 (DE CARVALHO CARLOS EDUARDO [BR], et al) | by applicant | US2004217976 | US2013169807 |