EP3001075 - LIGHTWEIGHT PISTON ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Kirchdorf GmbH Liebherrstrasse 12 88457 Kirchdorf / DE | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lavergne, Hans-Peter Dannecker Str. 4 87779 Trunkelsberg / DE | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 15186897.3 | 25.09.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | DE20141014436 | 29.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014014436 | [2016/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001075 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16J7/00, F15B15/14 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
F16J7/00 (EP);
F15B15/1457 (EP);
F15B2215/305 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTBAUKOLBENSTANGE | [2016/13] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT PISTON ROD | [2016/13] | French: | TIGE DE PISTON DE CONSTRUCTION LEGERE | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10317619 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 18 - paragraph 19; figure - *; | [X]DE102006025579 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE10202455 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102006047412 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |