EP3007101 - HISTORY GENERATING APPARATUS AND HISTORY GENERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oki, Makoto c/o Konica Minolta Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-7015 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15187589.5 | 30.09.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | JP20140208753 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014208753 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3007101 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3007101 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
H04N1/40 (CN);
H04N1/4105 (US);
H04N1/00278 (EP,US);
H04N1/0032 (EP,US);
H04N1/21 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HISTORIENERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HISTORIENERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/15] | English: | HISTORY GENERATING APPARATUS AND HISTORY GENERATING METHOD | [2016/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'HISTORIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'HISTORIQUE | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2019 | 21.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/17] | 14.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1555804 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0012] - [0022] - [0045] - [0098] - [0114]; figures 2-4,9 * [I] 2-13; | [XI]US2008253647 (CHO SEUNGYEON [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0045]; figures 1,2,4,5 * [I] 2-13; | [XI]US2009074291 (IINUMA OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] - [0063] - [0091]; figures 2,5; claims 1-8 *[I] 2-13; | [XI]US2010329548 (YOSHIMURA HIDEYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [0028] - [0052]; figure 2; claims 1-10 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0104] - [0127]; figure 5 * [I] 2-13 | by applicant | JPH07296140 | JP2005205853 | JP2011010023 |