EP3002151 - ISOLATING MECHANICAL CONNECTOR FOR OVERHEAD ELECTRICAL POWER LINE, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE CONNECTOR IN AN OVERHEAD ELECTRICAL POWER LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conductis B.V. 28, Gerardus van Sillevoldtstraat 3065 LG Rotterdam / NL | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states EM Power Systems B.V. 25, Maisland 3833 CR Leusden / NL | ||
For all designated states Conductis B.V. 28, Gerardus van Sillevoldtstraat 3065 LG Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BEKKUM, Mark Peter Roland Holstlaan 1115 2624 KM Delft / NL | 02 /
KOUWENHOVEN, Jacobus Leo Marie Meloenstraat 146 2564 TL Den Haag / NL | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2016/14] | Application number, filing date | 15188170.3 | 02.10.2015 | [2016/14] | Priority number, date | NL20142013558 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: NL 2013558 | [2016/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002151 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3002151 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60M1/18, B60M1/30, H02G1/04 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
B60M1/18 (EP);
B60M1/305 (EP);
H02G1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2016/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNG EINES MECHANISCHEN VERBINDERS FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSLEITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DES VERBINDERS IN EINER HOCHSPANNUNGSLEITUNG | [2016/14] | English: | ISOLATING MECHANICAL CONNECTOR FOR OVERHEAD ELECTRICAL POWER LINE, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING THE CONNECTOR IN AN OVERHEAD ELECTRICAL POWER LINE | [2016/14] | French: | ISOLATION D'UN CONNECTEUR MÉCANIQUE POUR LIGNE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE AÉRIENNE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INSÉRER LE CONNECTEUR DANS UNE LIGNE ÉLECTRIQUE AÉRIENNE | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2015 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | PT | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.10.2015 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
PT | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3305723 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 7; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]CN201245083Y (GUANGZHOU METRO GENERAL COMPAN [CN]) [Y] 1-8,10 * abstract *; | [YA]JP2002240597 (HIGASHI NIPPON RYOKAKU TETSUDO, et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]CN101531148 (WEIGUO GU) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0646488 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |