EP3153505 - NOVEL BIS-INDOLYLMETHANES, A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKER, Acelya c/o Yildiz Technik Üniversitesi Fen-Edebiyat Fakültesi Kimya Bölümü/D-2012 Davutpasa Yerlekesi 34220- Esenler-Istanbul / TR | 02 /
OCAL, Nuket c/o Yildiz Technical University, Faculty of Art and Sciences Department of Chemistry, Davutpasa Campus Esenler-Istanbul / TR | 03 /
BAYRAK, Hikmet Nil c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | 04 /
HAMITBEYLI, Agamirze c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | [2018/23] |
Former [2018/16] | 01 /
AKER, Acelya c/o Yildiz Technik Üniversitesi Fen-Edebiyat Fakültesi Kimya Bölümü/D-2012 Davutpasa Yerlekesi 34220- Esenler-Istanbul / TR | ||
02 /
OCAL, Nuket Gebze Technical University, Department of Chemistry Faculty of Science P.O. Box 141, Gebze 41400 Kocaeli / TR | |||
03 /
BAYRAK, Hikmet Nil c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | |||
04 /
HAMITBEYLI, Agamirze c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | |||
Former [2017/15] | 01 /
AKER, Acelya c/o Yildiz Technik Üniversitesi Fen-Edebiyat Fakültesi Kimya Bölümü/D-2012 Davutpasa Yerlekesi 34220- Esenler-Istanbul / TR | ||
02 /
OCAL, Nuket c/o Yildiz Technical University, Faculty of Art and Sciences Department of Chemistry Davutpasa Campus 34220 Esenler-Istanbul / TR | |||
03 /
ERGINDEMIR, Hikmet Nil c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | |||
04 /
HAMITBEYLI, Agamirze c/o Sanko Tekstil Isletmeleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde 16400 Inegol - Bursa / TR | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2017/15] | Application number, filing date | 15188403.8 | 05.10.2015 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153505 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3153505 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/10, C07D209/12, C07D209/14, A41D31/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
C07D209/12 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (CN);
C07D209/10 (EP,US);
C07D209/14 (EP,US);
D06M13/325 (US);
D06M15/333 (CN);
D06M16/00 (CN);
A41D2400/26 (EP,US);
A41D31/30 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/30, C08F116/06 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2017/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE BIS-INDOLYLMETHANE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/15] | English: | NOVEL BIS-INDOLYLMETHANES, A PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF | [2017/15] | French: | NOUVEAUX BIS-INDOLYLMÉTHANES, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/15] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2017/15: If details are not fully discernible, that is due to the quality of the drawings filed by the applicant. | Examination procedure | 05.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2015 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | IE | 05.10.2018 | LU | 05.10.2018 | MT | 05.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.10.2015 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
MT | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
MT | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DAMODIRAN M ET AL, "Regioselective synthesis and biological evaluation of bis(indolyl)methane derivatized 1,4-disubstituted 1,2,3-bistriazoles as anti-infective agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.04.131, ISSN 0960-894X, (20090701), pages 3611 - 3614, (20090503), XP026155119 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.04.131 | [A] - SHARMA D. K. ET AL., "A new class of bactericidal agents against S. aureus, MRSA and VRE derived from bisindolylmethane", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (20130904), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 1643 - 1653, XP002752541 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00044-013-0764-4 |