EP3006163 - SPARK PLUG ELECTRODE GAP SETTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2018/27] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESALVO, Peter John 7575 Baymeadows Way Jacksonville, FL Florida 32256-7525 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Coric, Dragan, et al General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Foster, Christopher Michael, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2016/15] | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15188410.3 | 05.10.2015 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | US201414509727 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US201414509727 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006163 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006163 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25B7/04, B25B7/08, B25B27/00, H01T21/06, B21D5/02 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
H01T21/06 (EP,US);
B21D5/02 (US);
B25B27/0035 (EP,US);
B25B7/04 (EP,US);
B25B7/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | B25B7/04, B25B7/08, B25B27/00, H01T21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2016/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUM SETZEN DES ZÜNDKERZENELEKTRODENABSTANDS | [2016/15] | English: | SPARK PLUG ELECTRODE GAP SETTING TOOL | [2016/15] | French: | OUTIL DE RÉGLAGE DE L'ESPACE D'ÉLECTRODE DE BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 29.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2015 | AL | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IE | 05.10.2018 | LU | 05.10.2018 | MT | 05.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
MT | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
MT | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
MT | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR515205 (ALEXANDRE GUILLAUME FITTE [FR]) [Y] 3,4,6-10,14,15 * figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US1608176 (HOBBS WILLIS F, et al) [X] 1 * pages 2,5 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]US2553620 (OLDS YEAZELL WILLIAM) [Y] 5,11-13* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2645142 (OTTO SCHWENZFEIER) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2670643 (CLARK WILLIAM H) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2014055081 (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2A,2B * [Y] 2-15 |