EP3156661 - DOMESTIC WATER SYSTEM OR PUMP WITH A CHECK VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/16] | RETURN VALVE AND DOMESTIC WATER SYSTEM THEREWITH | ||
[2023/30] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sierakowski-Sørensen, Janus Lukas Tranevej 36 8382 Hinnerup / DK | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/49] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | ||
Former [2017/16] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 15189914.3 | 15.10.2015 | [2017/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156661 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3156661 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42, F04D15/00, F04D13/16, F16K15/06, F16K27/02, // F04D13/06, F04D29/62, F04D1/06 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F16K27/0209 (EP,US);
F04D9/02 (RU);
F16K15/025 (CN);
F04B53/10 (CN);
F04D13/06 (EP,US);
F04D13/16 (EP,RU,US);
F04D15/0005 (CN);
F04D15/0022 (EP,US);
F04D29/4293 (EP,US);
F16K15/063 (EP,RU,US);
F04D1/06 (EP,US);
F04D29/628 (EP,US);
F05D2250/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | F04D29/42, F04D15/00, F16K15/06, F16K27/02, F16J13/12, // F04D13/06, F04D29/62, F04D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HAUSWASSERWERK ODER PUMPE MIT EINEM RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL | [2023/30] | English: | DOMESTIC WATER SYSTEM OR PUMP WITH A CHECK VALVE | [2023/30] | French: | INSTALLATION D'EAU DOMESTIQUE OU POMPE AVEC CLAPET ANTI-RETOUR | [2023/30] |
Former [2017/16] | RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL UND HAUSWASSERWERK DAMIT | ||
Former [2017/16] | RETURN VALVE AND DOMESTIC WATER SYSTEM THEREWITH | ||
Former [2017/16] | CLAPET ANTI-RETOUR ET INSTALLATION D'EAU DOMESTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB350836 (JENKINS BROS LTD); | [XI]EP0992687 (GARDENA KRESS & KASTNER GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP2211057 (GARDENA MFG GMBH [DE]) | Examination | GB347563 | US4986502 | US2005232796 |