EP3159085 - TOOL AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grasberger, Stefan Fidelisstr. 11 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 02 /
Kleine, Werner An der Marsch 29 28832 Achim / DE | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15190368.9 | 19.10.2015 | [2017/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159085 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02, B25D17/02, G09F3/04 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
B23B51/02 (EP);
B25D17/02 (EP);
B23B2226/75 (EP);
B23B2251/248 (EP);
B23B2260/104 (EP);
B23B2260/114 (EP);
B23B2270/30 (EP);
B23B2270/32 (EP);
B23B2270/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/17] | English: | TOOL AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2017/17] | French: | OUTIL ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102013004582 (KOMET GROUP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,10-12 * the whole document * [I] 5,7-9,13,14; | [XAI]GB346217 (HENRY SAMUEL POTTER) [X] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 76; figures 3,4 * [A] 8-12 [I] 2,5-7,13,14; | [XAI]US3856107 (RABETT R) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-4 * [A] 5,7-12 [I] 2,13,14; | [XAI]US5147164 (FRAVER PAUL C [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 4, lines 4-24; figures 1-4 * [A] 5-7,10-12,14 [I] 2,8,9,13; | [A]US1984839 (LESLIE MURRAY GUY) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003026669 (LANG MARCO [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS63229211 (UNION TOOL KK) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102010031091 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011013999 (MOSELEY STEVEN [AT], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015096548 (QUINN THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |