EP3015308 - VEHICULAR CHARGE/DISCHARGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-8556 / JP | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUNO, Koichi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/18] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15190766.4 | 21.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | JP20140219152 | 28.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014219152 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015308 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3015308 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, B60L11/18, H01M10/42, H01M10/44, H04B3/54 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/20 (EP,US);
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
B60L53/51 (EP,US);
B60L53/60 (EP,US);
B60L55/00 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H02J7/00036 (EP,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | B60L11/18, H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H04B3/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLADE-/-ENTLADESYSTEM | [2016/18] | English: | VEHICULAR CHARGE/DISCHARGE SYSTEM | [2016/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE POUR VÉHICULE | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 19.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2015 | AL | 23.05.2018 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | PT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | IE | 21.10.2018 | LU | 21.10.2018 | MT | 21.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MK | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
MT | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
MT | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
MT | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
MT | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 21.10.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012098488 (ICHIKAWA SHINJI [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0076] *; | [Y]WO2013065374 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 16 - page 67 *; | [A]EP2733815 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP2787597 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0163] * | by applicant | JP2013158218 |