EP3023569 - SPACER FOR SPACING GLASS SHEETS OF A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SPACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/21] | SPACER FOR SPACING GLASS SHEETS OF A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SPACER | ||
[2017/46] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALU-PRO srl Via A. Einstein 8 30030 Noale / IT | [2018/23] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states ALU-PRO srl Via A. Einstein 8 30030 Noale / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mäder, Hans Rudolf Gallusäckerstrasse 23 9402 Mörschwil / CH | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2016/21] | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 15191282.1 | 10.04.2012 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | EP20110162316 | 13.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11162316 | EP20110196113 | 29.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11196113 | [2016/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3023569 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023569 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/663 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
E06B3/66328 (EP);
E06B3/66361 (EP);
E06B2003/6638 (EP);
E06B2003/6639 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABSTANDHALTER FÜR DIE BEABSTANDUNG VON GLASSCHEIBEN EINES MEHRFACHVERGLASTEN FENSTERS | [2017/46] | English: | SPACER FOR SPACING GLASS SHEETS OF A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SPACER | [2021/22] | French: | ÉCARTEUR POUR ECARTER LES VERRES D'UNE FENETRE MULTI-VITRAGE, FENETRE MULTI-VITRAGE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ECARTEUR | [2021/22] |
Former [2016/21] | ABSTANDHALTER FÜR DIE BEABSTANDUNG VON GLASSCHEIBEN EINES MEHRFACHVERGLASTEN FENSTERS, EIN MEHRFACHVERGLASTES FENSTER, SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABSTANDHALTERS | ||
Former [2016/21] | SPACER FOR SPACING GLASS SHEETS OF A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, A MULTIPLE GLAZED WINDOW, AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SPACER | ||
Former [2016/22] | ÉCARTEUR POUR ÉCARTER LES VERRES D'UNE FENÊTRE MULTI-VITRAGE, FENÊTRE MULTI-VITRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉCARTEUR | Examination procedure | 23.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12714669.4 / EP2697466 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2019
06.03.2019
ADMISSIBLE Technoform Glass Insulation Holding GmbH Max-Planck-Straße 6 34253 Lohfelden / DE Opponent's representative Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2022/12] |
Former [2019/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2019
06.03.2019
ADMISSIBLE Technoform Glass Insulation Holding GmbH Max-Planck-Straße 1-3 34253 Lohfelden / DE Opponent's representative Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | 19.03.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.07.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 05.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T1767/21 | 05.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 08.12.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T1767/21 | 07.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.12.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2012 | AL | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | AT | 10.04.2019 | GB | 10.04.2019 | IE | 10.04.2019 | LU | 10.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.04.2012 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.04.2012 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2010115456 (PROWERB ST GALLEN AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, lines 8-22 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 2; figure 1 *[A] 4,5 | by applicant | US5851609 | WO2010011545 | Opposition | US5830545 | EP1029661 | WO2004081331 | DE102004031203 | WO2008022877 |