EP3015701 - WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH BOND PASTE INSPECTION WINDOW AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUSO, Christopher Daniel 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
YARBROUGH, Aaron A. 300 Garlington Road Greenville, NY New York 29615 / US | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 15191337.3 | 23.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | US201414529275 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: US201414529275 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015701 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3015701 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/04, B29C65/48, B29C65/54, B29C65/00, F03D80/50, F16B11/00, F03D1/06 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B23P15/04 (US);
B29C65/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/1162 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/61 (EP);
B29C66/636 (EP);
B29C66/97 (EP,US);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
F16B11/006 (EP,US);
B29C65/483 (EP,US);
B29C65/542 (EP,US);
B29C66/543 (EP,US);
B29L2031/085 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | F03D1/00, F03D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTORBLATT MIT VERBINDUNGSPASTENINSPEKTIONSFENSTER UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2017/30] | English: | WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH BOND PASTE INSPECTION WINDOW AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2016/18] | French: | PALE D'ÉOLIENNE AVEC FENÊTRE D'INSPECTION DE PÂTE ADHESIVE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/18] | WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT VERBINDUNGSPASTENINSPEKTIONSFENSTER UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/18] | PALE D'ÉOLIENNE AVEC FENÊTRE D'INSPECTION DE PÂTE DE SOUDURE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Examination procedure | 23.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 27.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2015 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 23.10.2017 | LU | 23.10.2017 | MT | 23.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | FR | 18.12.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 23.10.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 23.10.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.10.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.10.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.10.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 23.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
MT | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 23.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2011209347 (DEAK STEPHEN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,12-14 * paragraph [0008]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] * [A] 10,11 [Y] 5,15 [I] 3,9; | [Y]US2011215585 (CAIRES RICHARD [US]) [Y] 5,15 * paragraph [0087] *; | [A]US2012024457 (RAMM ULI [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2014294593 (LIU LIHUA [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037]; figures 4-5 * | by applicant | US8038407 | US8409381 |