EP3000849 - GRAPHITE NANOPLATELETS, COMPOSITES COMPRISING THEM, PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haydale Graphene Industries PLC Clos Fferws Parc Hendre Capel Hendre Ammanford Carmarthenshire SA18 3BL / GB | [2017/44] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Haydale Graphene Industries plc Clos Fferws Parc Hendre Capel Hendre Ammanford Carmarthenshire SA18 3BL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walters, Ian c/o Haydale Clos Fferws Parc Hendre Capel Hendre Ammanford SA18 3BL / GB | 02 /
Williams, Martin c/o Haydale Clos Fferws Parc Hendre Capel Hendre Ammanford SA18 3BL / GB | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15191861.2 | 08.12.2011 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | GB20100020836 | 08.12.2010 Original published format: GB 201020836 | GB20110017129 | 03.10.2011 Original published format: GB 201117129 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000849 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000849 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/08, C01B32/05, C01B32/20, C01B32/168, C01B32/174, C01B32/225, C09C1/44, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, H05H1/24 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
C01B32/225 (EP,BR,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,BR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,BR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,BR,US);
C01B32/168 (EP,US);
C01B32/174 (EP,US);
C09C1/44 (EP,US);
H01J37/32 (US);
H05H1/2431 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0818 (EP,US);
B01J2219/083 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0841 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0847 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0869 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0886 (EP,US);
C01P2002/84 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | C09C1/44, B01J19/08, C01B31/02, H01J9/02, C01B31/04, B82Y30/00, H05H1/24, B82Y40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GRAPHITNANOPLÄTTCHEN, VERBUNDSTOFFE DAMIT, HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2016/13] | English: | GRAPHITE NANOPLATELETS, COMPOSITES COMPRISING THEM, PREPARATION AND USES THEREOF | [2016/13] | French: | NANOPLAQUETTES DE GRAPHITE, COMPOSITES CONTENANT CES DERNIERS, LEUR PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11810859.6 / EP2649136 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Graphit Kropfmühl GmbH Langheinrichstraße 1 94051 Hauzenberg / DE | Date: | 31.05.2017 | [2017/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2011 | AL | 04.04.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | IE | 08.12.2018 | LU | 08.12.2018 | MT | 08.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.12.2011 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH06365 (II C KAGAKU KK, et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012]; figure 1; example 2 * [A] 3-6,8-10,13-15 [I] 11,12; | [XA]US2002054995 (MAZURKIEWICZ MARIAN [US]) [X] 13,14 * claims 1-21 * [A] 1-12,15; | [XA]US2008206124 (JANG BOR Z [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0034] - [0049]; claims 1-8 * [A] 1-12,15; | [XA]WO2009106507 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 13-15 * page 9, lines 17-30; example 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-12; | [XA]WO2009156275 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 13,14 * example 1; claims 1-4 * [A] 1-12,15; | [ADP]WO2010142953 (HAYDALE LTD [GB], et al) [ADP] 1-15* page 4, line 10 - page 13, line 9 *; | [XA] - BRUSER V ET AL, "Surface modification of carbon nanofibres in low temperature plasmas", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040401), vol. 13, no. 4-8, doi:10.1016/J.DIAMOND.2003.10.061, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1177 - 1181, XP004507940 [X] 1,2,7-9,11,12 * [Experimental];; figure 2; table 1 * [A] 3-6,10,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diamond.2003.10.061 | [A] - KIM J A ET AL, "Effects of surface modification on rheological and mechanical properties of CNT/epoxy composites", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 44, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2006.02.026, ISSN 0008-6223, (20060801), pages 1898 - 1905, (20060801), XP025011148 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2006.02.026 | by applicant | WO2010142953 |