EP3015604 - AN UNDERCARRIAGE FOR A WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JC Bamford Excavators Ltd Lakeside Works Rocester Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Price, David c/o J.C. Bamford Excavators Ltd Lakeside Works Uttoxeter, Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Foot, Paul Matthew James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London Greater London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15192196.2 | 29.10.2015 | [2016/18] | Priority number, date | GB20140019274 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: GB 201419274 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015604 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/02, E02F9/08 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
E02F9/02 (EP,US);
B60K25/06 (CN);
E02F9/085 (EP,GB,US);
E02F9/08 (US);
B60K8/00 (US);
B62D21/186 (US);
E02F3/325 (EP,US);
E02F3/964 (EP,US);
E02F9/00 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRWERK FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2016/18] | English: | AN UNDERCARRIAGE FOR A WORKING MACHINE | [2016/18] | French: | CHÂSSIS DE ROULEMENT POUR UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 16.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1507043 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP1930190 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0034] *; | [XI]WO2013084597 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * abstract * [I] 8,9 |