EP3163824 - MIMO DETECTION BASED ON GRADIENT SEARCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Baicheng Huawei Technologies Sweden AB Skalholtsgatan 9 16440 Kista / SE | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15192386.9 | 30.10.2015 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163824 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04L25/03891 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIMO-DETEKTION AUF GRUNDLAGE VON GRADIENTENSUCHE | [2017/18] | English: | MIMO DETECTION BASED ON GRADIENT SEARCHING | [2017/18] | French: | DÉTECTION MIMO BASÉE SUR LA RECHERCHE DE GRADIENT | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 10.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ARAVINDAN I ET AL, "A performance study of MIMO detectors in the presence of channel estimation errors", 2015 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION, INFORMATION & COMPUTING TECHNOLOGY (ICCICT), IEEE, (20150115), doi:10.1109/ICCICT.2015.7045683, pages 1 - 5, XP032737771 [X] 1,11,15 * Subsection A.Likelihood Ascent Search. * [I] 2-10,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCICT.2015.7045683 | [XI] - NISSANI D N, "The MIMO and ISI Detection Problems: A Common Model and a Quasi Optimal, Quadratic Complexity Solution", 2009 IEEE 69TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE; APRIL 26-29, 2009, BARCELONA, SPAIN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090426), ISBN 978-1-4244-2517-4, pages 1 - 6, XP031474828 [X] 1,11,15 * abstract * * Section IV. Proposed detection method * [I] 2-10,12-14 | [XI] - VISHNU VARDHAN K ET AL, "A Low-Complexity Detector for Large MIMO Systems and Multicarrier CDMA Systems", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20080401), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 473 - 485, XP011206978 [X] 1,11,15 * Subsection A. Proposed LAS Algorithm. Pages 475 and 476. * [I] 2-10,12-14 |