EP3018345 - FLUID-COLUMN HYDRAULIC MOTOR WITH IMPROVED MEANS FOR RETAINING THE PROPULSION MEMBERS AGAINST ASSOCIATED SLIDING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Hannifin Manufacturing S.r.l. Via Privata Archimede, 1 20094 Corsico (MI) / IT | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LEONARDIS, Loris Parker Hannifin Manufacturing S.r.l. Via Privata Archimede, 1 20094 CORSICO (MI) / IT | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Margherita Dott. Ing. Prof. Alfredo Raimondi S.r.l. Piazzale Cadorna, 15 20123 Milano / IT | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 15193031.0 | 04.11.2015 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | IT2014MI01917 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: IT MI20141917 | [2016/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018345 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018345 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04, F03C1/28, F03C1/32, F03C1/04, F04B53/16 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
F04B1/0408 (EP);
F04B1/0413 (EP);
F04B1/0421 (EP);
F04B1/0426 (EP);
F04B53/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | F04B1/04, F03C1/28, F03C1/32, F03C1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUID-SÄULEN-HYDRAULIKMOTOR MIT VERBESSERTEN MITTELN ZUM HALTEN DES ANTRIEBS GEGEN ZUGEHÖRIGE GLEITFLÄCHEN | [2017/04] | English: | FLUID-COLUMN HYDRAULIC MOTOR WITH IMPROVED MEANS FOR RETAINING THE PROPULSION MEMBERS AGAINST ASSOCIATED SLIDING SURFACES | [2016/19] | French: | MOTEUR À COLONNE DE FLUIDE HYDRAULIQUE DOTÉ DE MOYENS AMELIORÉS PERMETTANT DE RETENIR LES ÉLÉMENTS DE PROPULSION CONTRE DES SURFACES DE GLISSEMENT ASSOCIÉES | [2017/04] |
Former [2016/19] | FLUID-SÄULEN-HYDRAULIKMOTOR MIT VERBESSERTEN MITTELN ZUM HALTEN DES ANTRIEB GEGEN ZUGEHÖRIGE GLEITFLÄCHEN | ||
Former [2016/19] | MOTEUR A COLONNE DE FLUIDE HYDRAULIQUE DOTE DE MOYENS AMELIORES PERMETTANT DE RETENIR LES ELEMENTS DE PROPULSION CONTRE DES SURFACES DE GLISSEMENT ASSOCIEES | Examination procedure | 04.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2015 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | IE | 04.11.2017 | LU | 04.11.2017 | MT | 04.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
MT | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3726957 (DUESTERLOH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure 3 * * column 4, line 3 - line 25 * * column 7, line 6 - line 34 *; | [A]US4683806 (RYZNER CLEMENS [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1A, 4 * * column 2, line 9 - line 36 * * column 3, line 12 - line 26 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 14 *; | [AD]EP0851119 (RIVA CALZONI SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-5 * figures 1, 1a * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]US3577830 (ORTELLI AURELIO [IT]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 23 *; | [A]US3040716 (THEODOR HAHN) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]US4144799 (PONCHAUX JEAN-LUC) [A] 1-5 * figures 1, 2 * * column 3, line 27 - line 64 * * column 5, line 56 - column 7, line 7 *; | [A]US4310290 (DANTLGRABER JOERG, et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 2, 3 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 11 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 35 *; | [A]US3945766 (GELON ROBERT) [A] 1-5 * figures 1, 3 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 18 * | by applicant | EP0851119 | DE3726957 | US4683806 |