EP3061852 - GAS EXCHANGE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstraße 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOGAR, Andreas Traminerweg 2 71726 Benningen / DE | 02 /
KÖRNER, Stephan Entengasse 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | 03 /
ROSE, Reinhard Reußensteinstraße 28/2 70736 Fellbach / DE | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 15193463.5 | 06.11.2015 | [2016/35] | Priority number, date | DE201410225741 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014225741 | [2016/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3061852 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3061852 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/14, C25D7/00, C25D17/12, F01L3/04, F01L3/20, // C25D5/08 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
F01L3/20 (EP,US);
C25D17/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/14 (EP,US);
C25D5/617 (EP,US);
C25D7/00 (EP,US);
F01L3/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASWECHSELVENTIL | [2016/35] | English: | GAS EXCHANGE VALVE | [2016/35] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INVERSION DE COUPLE | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0266020 (BURLINGTON INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 17, lines 21-25 * * page 19, line 22 - page 20, line 3 * * page 21, lines 5-10 * [Y] 2,3,6,8,9 [I] 5,7; | [Y]US5370364 (KENMOKU TAKEJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, lines 42-45 *; | [Y]EP0679736 (FUJI VALVE [JP]) [Y] 3,8,9 * abstract * * figure 2 ** claim 1 *; | [YD]DE10358729 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [YD] 6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] * | by applicant | DE10358729 |