EP3032511 - HOLDING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Straße 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hucker, Matthias, Dr. Lorenzstr. 20 76359 Marxzell / DE | 02 /
Huber, Dirk Ziegelstr. 7 71409 Schwaikheim / DE | 03 /
Palminteri, Daniel Goethestr. 38 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 15193469.2 | 06.11.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | DE201410225297 | 09.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014225297 | [2016/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032511 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00, G08B25/01, G08B25/04, G08B25/10, E05F15/72 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G08B25/04 (EP);
G08B25/009 (EP);
G08B25/018 (EP);
G08B25/10 (EP);
G08B17/00 (EP);
G08B25/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTSTELLANLAGE | [2016/24] | English: | HOLDING INSTALLATION | [2016/24] | French: | INSTALLATION DE BLOCAGE | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0951001 (APOLLO FIRE DETECTORS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1246150 (JOB LIZENZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2006082461 (ANDRES JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052] *; | [A] - Delta Schalter ET AL, "DELTA reflex Rauchmelder - VdS-geprüft nach EN 14604 Auswahl-und Bestelldaten (Stand 03/2010)", (20100331), URL: http://cdn.billiger.com/dynimg/ggsHzx6-J3EJZp_QBtYShDt4H9rycHjeBa9LTdXG2DAub3LzKZcXcqIj4Gkq9jAAJoDuIXAg3U5DpjYnAD3otI/SIEMENS-Delta-reflex-SD9-Katalogansicht-be9e04.pdf, (20160421), XP055267500 [A] 3,4 * Siehe die Beschreibung bezüglich der Produkte mit den Bestellnummern "5TC1 290" und "5WG3 255-8AB01". * |