EP3018315 - CATALYST DEVICE FOR A STATIONARY COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co OG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | [2018/33] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states GE Jenbacher GmbH & Co. OG Achenseestrasse 1-3 6200 Jenbach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillen, Friedhelm Bräupark 2 6200 Jenbach / AT | 02 /
Url, Michael Buchenweg 15 85375 Neufahrn / DE | 03 /
Mehring, Max Dorf 2 6260 Bruck am Ziller / AT | 04 /
Sieberer, Manfred Egererweg 36 Top 4 6336 Lankampfen / AT | 05 /
Manickam, Bhuvaneswaran Bienerstrasse 85 Top 10 6240 Rattenberg / AT | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 15193604.4 | 09.11.2015 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | AT20140050823 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: AT 508232014 | [2016/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018315 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018315 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18, F01N13/20, F01N3/28 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
F01N3/28 (EP,AT,US);
F01N3/20 (CN);
F01N13/18 (US);
B01D53/9431 (US);
B01D53/944 (US);
F01N13/017 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (US);
F01N3/2066 (AT,CN,US);
F01N3/2803 (AT);
F01N3/2807 (AT,US);
F01N3/2882 (US);
F01N3/2892 (CN);
F02B33/40 (EP,US);
F02B37/001 (EP,US);
F01N2350/00 (EP,US);
F01N2450/00 (CN);
F01N2450/30 (EP,US);
F01N2590/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | F01N3/28, F01N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KATALYSATOREINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE STATIONÄRE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2016/19] | English: | CATALYST DEVICE FOR A STATIONARY COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF CATALYSEUR POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE FIXE | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2015 | AL | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | IE | 09.11.2018 | LU | 09.11.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 09.11.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 09.11.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS5471766 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9-19; | [XI]JPS5484868 (KANDEN HANKIYUU SHIYOUJI KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9-19; | [XI]JPS62121638 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9-19; | [XI]JPS62191026 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9-19; | [A]DE3825958 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 11* abstract *; | [XI]US2004009874 (KOIKE HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * [I] 9-19 | Examination | EP1367233 | DE102005056423 | DE102011079785 | by applicant | DE19921263 | EP1367233 | DE102008043726 | US2014178263 | US2015247438 |