EP3037260 - SHEET ROOFING WITH PRE-TAPED SEAMS AND TAPE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johns Manville 717 Seventeenth Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGRAW, Ethan Nelson 16229 Riley Street Holland, MI Michigan 49424 / US | 02 /
FURGAL, Troy 612 Columbia Drive New Lenox, IL Illinois 60451 / US | 03 /
NATHAN, Todd 6000 West Mansfield Avenue Denver, CO Colorado 80235 / US | 04 /
OLSON, Eric Alden 1682 East 100th Place Thornton, CO Colorado 80229 / US | 05 /
SUKLE, Zebonie 2915 South York Street Denver, CO Colorado 80210 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer Kreuzberger Ring 64 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 15194018.6 | 11.11.2015 | [2016/26] | Priority number, date | US201414557053 | 01.12.2014 Original published format: US201414557053 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3037260 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3037260 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B3/06, E04D5/14, B32B5/02, B32B7/04, B32B7/06, B32B25/04, B32B25/06, B32B25/08 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
E04D5/142 (EP,US);
B32B25/042 (EP,US);
B32B25/06 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/05 (EP,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
E04D5/148 (EP,US);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/12 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2307/748 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | B32B7/12, B32B3/06, E04D5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIENDACH MIT ZUVOR ABGEKLEBTEN NÄHTEN UND KLEBEBAND DAFÜR | [2016/26] | English: | SHEET ROOFING WITH PRE-TAPED SEAMS AND TAPE THEREFOR | [2016/26] | French: | FEUILLE AUVENT AVEC COUTURES PRE-ADHÉSIVES ET BANDE À CET EFFET | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003124292 (UNTERREITER KARL [AU]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 1b,4b,5; claims 1,2 * [Y] 6,18,22 [I] 4; | [X]US2011091675 (SIMPSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0037] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE202006017586U (JAFOPLAST BAUPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8-17 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1,2,7 *; | [Y]DE29722745U (JAFOPLAST FOLIEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8-17 * page 4, line 10 - line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [IY]US4601935 (METCALF FREDRIC D [US], et al) [I] 19-21,23 * column 2, line 61 - line 68 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 14 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,18,22; | [A]US2004244315 (RUST PAUL RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 18-23 * paragraph [0070] * * figures 6a, 6b; claim 1 * |