EP3021029 - HANGER DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Yasuyoshi Meitec Corporation 8-5-26, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
NISHIKORI, Taku Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Ettmayr, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 15194754.6 | 16.11.2015 | [2016/20] | Priority number, date | JP20140233158 | 17.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014233158 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021029 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
F16M11/041 (EP,US);
H05K7/186 (US);
F16M11/048 (EP,US);
F16M13/00 (EP,US);
F16M13/02 (US);
F16M2200/025 (EP,US);
F16M2200/028 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2016/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄNGERVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2016/20] | English: | HANGER DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2016/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SUSPENSION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2016/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000184953 (NAKAE MITSUGI) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2009026346 (SHIBATA YOSHINORI [JP]) [A] 2-12 * figures 1-23 * * paragraphs [0069] , [0070] , [0072] , [0074] , [0076] *; | [A]US2014205394 (CHAO CHIEN-HSING [TW]) [A] 2-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0088] , [0089] , [0093] - [0095] - [0114] - [0116] *; | [X] - Lee Neikirk, "BenQ XL2430T Gaming Monitor REview", Reviewed.com, (20141112), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://monitors.reviewed.com/content/benq-xl2430t-gaming-monitor-review, (20160401), XP055262169 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | - Yamaha Corporation YDP-123 Owner's Manual, page 13 | - Catalog Headphones, (2014), vol. 2, page 70 | - Architectural Hardware General Catalog, (2014), page 468 |