EP3023959 - MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAMARU, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
WAKEYAMA, Daisuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO, Hideyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YAMANISHI, Koji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
TSUJI, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 15195021.9 | 17.11.2015 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | JP20140235963 | 20.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014235963 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3023959 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3023959 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/04, G08B29/18, G08B13/196 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
G08B13/19658 (EP,US);
G08B25/10 (US);
G08B13/19684 (EP,US);
G08B25/014 (US);
G08B29/04 (EP,US);
G08B29/181 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/21] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM | [2016/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003062997 (NAIDOO SURENDRA N [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0079] - [0081]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2007042804 (RYLEY GORDON [CA], et al) [Y] 1,10* paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0014] - [0016] - [0021] - [0023] - [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0039] - [0045] - [0047] , [0051] *; | [YD]JP2007323533 (ODELIC CO LTD) [YD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] - [0031] *; | [Y]CN201509252U (TIANJIN SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]KR20130048358 (CVNET CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-3,7-9 * page 2, paragraph first * | by applicant | JP2007323533 |