EP3171578 - METHOD OF IMPROVED FINDING SOMEONE OR SOMETHING WITHIN A LARGER GROUP OF PEOPLE OR THINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Rebecca Oberseestraße 7 81825 München / DE | 02 /
MacWilliams, Asa Am Sulzbogen 44 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15195199.3 | 18.11.2015 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3171578 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G06F3/01, G06Q50/00, // G08B1/08, H04M1/22, G08B6/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP);
H04M1/72412 (EP);
G08B2001/085 (EP);
G08B6/00 (EP);
H04M1/22 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | H04M1/725, G06F3/01, G06Q50/00, // G08B1/08, H04M1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERTEN AUFFINDEN EINER PERSON ODER EINES GEGENSTANDS INNERHALB EINER GRÖSSEREN GRUPPE VON PERSONEN ODER GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2017/21] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVED FINDING SOMEONE OR SOMETHING WITHIN A LARGER GROUP OF PEOPLE OR THINGS | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECHERCHE AMÉLIORÉE D'UNE PERSONNE OU D'UN OBJET À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN GRAND GROUPE DE PERSONNES OU DE CHOSES | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004046656 (SCHAEFER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]EP2323351 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] ** figure 3 *; | [XI]US2014247132 (FUKUMA YOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0182] - paragraph [0183] * * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0197] * [I] 2-7; | [A]US2014333211 (OKA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0209] * * figure 9 *; | [AD] - Sarah Griffiths, "Never lose a friend in the crowd again! App transforms phones into attention grabbing flashing beacons of light", (20150212), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.dailymail.co.uk/sciencetech/article-2950933/Never-lose-friend-crowd-App-transforms-phones-attention-grabbing-flashing-beacons-light.html, (20160426), XP055268620 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007069889 |