EP3006041 - METHODS FOR PREPARING COMPLEX MULTIVALENT IMMUNOGENIC CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services The National Institute of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulvard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Che-Hung Robert 16 Amberleigh Drive Silver Spring, MD 20905 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2016/15] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15195219.9 | 16.03.2007 | [2016/15] | Priority number, date | US20060783490P | 17.03.2006 Original published format: US 783490 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006041 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006041 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K39/08, A61K39/095, A61K39/00, C07K1/08, A61K39/116 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,KR,US);
C07K1/084 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/08 (KR);
A61K39/095 (KR);
A61K39/116 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/62 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | A61K39/385, A61K39/08, A61K39/095, A61K39/00, A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN KOMPLEXER MEHRWERTIGER IMMUNOGENER KONJUGATE | [2016/15] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARING COMPLEX MULTIVALENT IMMUNOGENIC CONJUGATES | [2016/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CONJUGUÉS IMMUNOGÉNIQUES MULTIVALENTS COMPLEXES | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 12.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07753268.7 / EP1993604 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2007 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | IT | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IE | 16.03.2018 | LU | 16.03.2018 | MT | 16.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.03.2007 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02058737 (AVENTIS PASTEUR [US], et al); | [AD]US2005002948 (RYALL ROBERT P [US]); | [XY]WO2005037320 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [A]WO2005117965 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); | [XP]WO2006077397 (AMURA THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | US5651971 | US5965714 | WO0004922 | WO02058737 | WO03007985 | US2005002948 | WO2005014037 | WO2005037320 |