EP3023862 - POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/31] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNWOO, Seunghui Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Junyun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seongeun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jungsik Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Heungsik Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jinwoo Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
HONG, Hyunju Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Jacobs, Bart, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 15195679.4 | 20.11.2015 | [2016/21] | Priority number, date | KR20140163599 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: KR 20140163599 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3023862 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3023862 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3023862 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, G06F1/16 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
G06F1/1647 (EP,US);
G06F1/3218 (EP,CN,US);
G06F1/3296 (US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1677 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F1/3215 (EP,US);
G06F1/3231 (EP,US);
G06F1/3265 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2016/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS | [2016/21] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION | [2016/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LA CONSOMMATION DE PUISSANCE | [2016/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2015 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | IE | 20.11.2019 | LU | 20.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IE | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
LU | 20.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009070606 (CHEN SHING-CHIA [TW], et al) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * figure 3 ** paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2010317408 (FERREN BRAN [US], et al) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2011172984 (CHER CHEN-YONG [US], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] *; | [Y]US2011234617 (WATANABE TOOMA [JP]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]EP2479967 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074] *; | [Y]US2012299980 (FUJIKAWA MASAYA [JP]) [Y] 3,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2012319965 (KURABAYASHI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2013073256 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7,10,11 * abstract * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 2 * * page 7, line 12 - line 14 *; | [XY]US2014189395 (KP SAMEER [IN]) [X] 1,2,7,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] * [Y] 3,4,7,10-13; | [A]US2014232731 (HOLLAND PETER [US], et al) [A] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * |