EP3031409 - ANEURYSM FILLER DELIVERY SYSTEM AND CATHETER TIP TO AID FILAMENT DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUREY, Aidan Vestbanevej 15, 4th 2500 Valby / DK | 02 /
HANSEN, Palle Munk Granvej 56, Vemmedrup 4632 Bjaeverskov / DK | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Maitland, Matthew Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15195735.4 | 20.11.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | US201462082363P | 20.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462082363 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3031409 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3031409 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61M25/00 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/1214 (EP,US);
A61B17/12113 (US);
A61B17/12031 (EP,US);
A61B17/12118 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1205 (US);
A61M25/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANEURYSMENFÜLLSTOFFABGABESYSTEM UND KATHETERSPITZE ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER FILAMENTABGABE | [2016/24] | English: | ANEURYSM FILLER DELIVERY SYSTEM AND CATHETER TIP TO AID FILAMENT DELIVERY | [2016/24] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DE MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE D'ANÉVRISME ET POINTE DE CATHÉTER AFIN DE FACILITER L'ADMINISTRATION D'UN FILAMENT | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002026217 (BAKER STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,13,14 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074]; figures 5,9,18,23,24,27 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0092] *; | [X]WO0215972 (COUNTER CLOCKWISE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,13,14 * page 6, line 28 - page 9, line 2; figures 10A-11D * * page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 15 *; | [X]US2002111646 (GIFFORD HANSON S [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * figures 6,7,8 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [X]US2007237720 (PADILLA ORLANDO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,13-15 * paragraph [0348] - paragraph [0354]; figures 2,6,7B,8 * * paragraph [0369] - paragraph [0383] *; | [X]US2008287982 (HARRELD JOHN H [US]) [X] 10-12 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1A,3 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [X]WO2009132141 (COHEREX MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * figures 1,4A,4B * * paragraph [0049] *; | [X]US2010076484 (RIINA HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13 * paragraph [0059]; figures 2,5,21-32 * * paragraph [0084] *; | [X]US2012158034 (WILSON THOMAS S [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * figures 16G-16I,17 * * paragraph [0084] *; | [I]US2012265287 (SHARMA UPMA [US], et al) [I] 10,11 * paragraph [0072] ** paragraph [0073]; figures 3,4a *; | [X]US2013190800 (MURPHY RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13,14 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-3,18A-18E * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2013197570 (EBATA KATSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9,13-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0092]; figures 2A-8C * |