EP3032883 - GEOGRAPHICAL DETECTION OF MOBILE TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone IP Licensing Limited The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McQuaid, Gerald c/o Group Legal (Patents), Vodafone Group Services Limited, One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London, W2 6BY / GB | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15196684.3 | 27.11.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | GB20140021815 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201421815 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3032883 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3032883 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/04, // H04W8/18, H04W12/08 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04W48/04 (EP,GB,US);
H04M15/58 (US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,GB,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEOGRAFISCHE DETEKTION VON MOBILEN ENDGERÄTEN | [2016/24] | English: | GEOGRAPHICAL DETECTION OF MOBILE TERMINALS | [2016/24] | French: | DÉTECTION GÉOGRAPHIQUE DE TERMINAUX MOBILES | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011081885 (SENNETT DEWAYNE A [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract ** paragraphs [0014] , [0023] , [0017] *; | [YA]US2011183646 (KRAMARZ-VONKOHOUT GERHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 18,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0031] , [0070] * [A] 1-17,20-22; | [XY]US2011319010 (NELKENBAUM YOSSI [IL]) [X] 1-5,7-17,20-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0010] , [0020] - [0023] - [0025] - [0029] - [0031] , [0039] - [0044] - [0049] - [0050] * [Y] 6,18,19; | [A]EP2677814 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0055] - [0056] *; | [YA]GB2507119 (IP ACCESS LTD [GB]) [Y] 6,18,19 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 4; figure 1 * [A] 1-5,7-17,20-22 |