EP3012767 - CONTROLLED ACCESS TO FUNCTIONALITY OF A WIRELESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERREN, Bran 1236 Benedict Canyon Drive Beverley Hills, CA 90210 / US | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15196853.4 | 09.06.2010 | [2016/17] | Priority number, date | US20090187520P | 16.06.2009 Original published format: US 187520 P | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3012767 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F3/0488 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/0065 (EP,CN,US);
G02B13/009 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/02 (KR);
G03B17/12 (KR);
G03B3/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/40 (EP);
G06F3/02 (EP,US);
G06F3/0236 (US);
G06F3/0237 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0414 (EP,US);
G06F3/0418 (CN);
G06F3/04186 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06K7/10811 (EP,CN,US);
G06K7/1408 (KR);
G06Q20/3276 (EP);
G06Q20/4012 (US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/165 (US);
G06V40/19 (EP,CN,US);
G06V40/20 (US);
G06V40/45 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/083 (US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N23/45 (EP,US);
H04N23/63 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/183 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | GESTEUERTER ZUGANG ZU DEN FUNKTIONEN EINER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/17] | English: | CONTROLLED ACCESS TO FUNCTIONALITY OF A WIRELESS DEVICE | [2016/17] | French: | ACCÈS CONTRÔLÉ À LA FONCTIONNALITÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF SANS FIL | [2016/17] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2021 | 12.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/15] | 06.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10789959.3 / EP2443591 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1990770 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] ** claims 1-13 *; | [I]US2009083847 (FADELL ANTHONY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * |