EP3034864 - ROTOR HUB FOR A ROTOR OF A WIND POWER STATION WITH A ROTOR AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Service GmbH Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eusterbarkey, Carsten Rieke Reech 48 25813 Simonsberg / DE | 02 /
Trede, Alf Ahrenviöler Weg 20 25885 Immenstedt / DE | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 15196986.2 | 30.11.2015 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | DE201410226126 | 16.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014226126 | [2016/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3034864 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3034864 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
F03D1/0691 (EP);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2016/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTORNABE FÜR EINEN EINE ROTORACHSE AUFWEISENDEN ROTOR EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2016/25] | English: | ROTOR HUB FOR A ROTOR OF A WIND POWER STATION WITH A ROTOR AXIS | [2016/25] | French: | MOYEU DE ROTOR POUR UN ROTOR PRESENTANT UN AXE DE ROTOR D'UNE EOLIENNE | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2015 | AL | 03.08.2022 | BG | 03.08.2022 | CY | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | IT | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | MK | 03.08.2022 | MT | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | TR | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | IE | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | LU | 30.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
BG | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
TR | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
TR | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
MK | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
IT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CY | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.11.2015 | |
AL | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 03.08.2022 | |
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]DE10351524 (WEITKAMP ROLAND [DE]) [XD] 1,4-6,8,9,12,14-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - * [A] 7,13 [I] 2,3,10,11; | [XAI]EP1930584 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,11-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0063] * * figure - * [A] 8,9[I] 2,3,10; | [XAI]EP2562081 (IMO HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0051] * * figure - * [A] 8,9,13 [I] 2,3,10 | by applicant | WO0142647 | WO03064854 | DE10351524 | DE202004016206U | EP1933027 | DE102007014860 | WO2012131025 | EP2653719 |