EP3173062 - POLYMERIZATION LAMP AND COMPOSITES FOR FILLING TOOTH CAVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHILIPPS-UNIVERSITÄT MARBURG Biegenstrasse 10 35037 Marburg / DE | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gente, Michael Dohlenweg 12 35091 Cölbe / DE | 02 /
Kusch, Malte Osterstraße 50 31134 Hildesheim / DE | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Stumpf, Peter c/o TransMIT GmbH Kerkrader Strasse 3 35394 Gießen / DE | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15197159.5 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173062 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, A61C13/15 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A61C19/003 (EP);
A61C19/004 (EP);
A61K6/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISATIONSLAMPE UND KOMPOSITE ZUR FÜLLUNG VON ZAHNKAVITÄTEN | [2017/22] | English: | POLYMERIZATION LAMP AND COMPOSITES FOR FILLING TOOTH CAVITIES | [2017/22] | French: | LAMPE DE POLYMERISATION ET COMPOSITE DE REMPLISSAGE DE CAVITES DENTAIRES | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015111176 (WACHTER WOLFGANG [LI], et al) [X] 1,2 * examples 1, 3; claims 1, 10, 17 *; | [X]EP0336417 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * claims 1, 5-6; table VII *; | [XA]US2014296364 (MOSZNER NORBERT [LI], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0090] , [0 92]; table 1 * [A] 3,5-7; | [X]US2013344456 (JESSOP NEIL [US]) [X] 8 * claims 1, 4, 20 *; | [I]DE102006015336 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [I] 8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 35] , [0 38]; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102012018384 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [A] 14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 25]; claim 13 * | [X] - SCHNEIDER L F J ET AL, "Influence of photoinitiator type on the rate of polymerization, degree of conversion, hardness and yellowing of dental resin composites", DENTAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 24, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.DENTAL.2008.01.007, ISSN 0109-5641, (20080901), pages 1169 - 1177, (20080305), XP022941039 [X] 1,2 * paragraph [02.1]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dental.2008.01.007 |