EP3032725 - MULTI-SLICE ROTARY ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALSIGER, Derick S. P.O. Box P.O. Box 1074 Mayer, AZ Arizona 86333 / US | 02 /
VAN DE VEIRE, Nicholas R. 2038 E. Harvard Drive Tempe, AZ Arizona 85283 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15197495.3 | 02.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | US201414558012 | 02.12.2014 Original published format: US201414558012 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032725 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3032725 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/06, // H02K7/14, H02K16/02, B64C13/50, B64C9/00, H02K7/10 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
B64C13/28 (EP,US);
H02K41/06 (EP,US);
F16H49/001 (EP);
H02K16/02 (EP,US);
H02K7/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | H02K41/06, // H02K7/14, H02K16/02, B64C13/50, B64C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTIERENDER MEHRSCHICHTIGER ELEKTROMECHANISCHER AKTUATOR | [2016/24] | English: | MULTI-SLICE ROTARY ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR | [2016/24] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE ROTATIF MULTICOUPE | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 03.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2015 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IE | 02.12.2017 | LU | 02.12.2017 | MT | 02.12.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
MT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB734446 (ARMSTRONG WHITWORTH CO ENG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004040737 (HADI ABU AKEEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 10; figure 6 * * abstract *; | [A]US2012074820 (TAKEUCHI KESATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract * | Examination | US2016229525 |