EP3176515 - DUCT JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Les Miroirs 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states ISOVER SAINT-GOBAIN Les Miroirs 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodian, Rene Finnedalsvej 1 2770 Kastrup / DK | 02 /
Legendre, Nicolas Georg-Mechtersheimer-Str. 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Nippa, Matthias Heideweg 1B 67134 Birkenheide / DE | 04 /
Wahls, Thorsten Plauener Str. 4 19386 Lübz / DE | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/23] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 15197536.4 | 02.12.2015 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176515 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3176515 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3176515 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/02, F16L23/14, F16L25/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
F24F13/0209 (EP);
F16L23/14 (EP);
F16L25/0009 (EP);
F24F13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEITUNGSFLANSCH | [2017/23] | English: | DUCT JOINT | [2017/23] | French: | JOINT DE CONDUIT | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.12.2015 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 26.02.2020 | |
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2221312 (MEZ GEORG) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [I]US4537430 (SULLIVAN MICHAEL T [CA]) [I] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0197466 (MEINIG METU SYSTEM [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]US5352000 (ISSAGHOLIAN-HAVAI ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]DE102013112175 (B ARC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * |