EP3040926 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MESSAGE DELIVERY BASED ON ON-DEVICE DATA ANALYSIS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states About Time Corp. B-402, 230, Pangyoyeok-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13493 / KR | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae Chun 104-1005, 50, Hyoryeong-ro 33-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06666 / KR | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15197937.4 | 04.12.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | KR20150000850 | 05.01.2015 Original published format: KR 20150000850 | KR20150023287 | 16.02.2015 Original published format: KR 20150023287 | KR20150028087 | 27.02.2015 Original published format: KR 20150028087 | KR20150031916 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: KR 20150031916 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040926 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04L51/06 (US);
H04L51/212 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR NACHRICHTENLIEFERUNG AUF GRUNDLAGE VON DATENANALYSE AUF DER VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2016/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MESSAGE DELIVERY BASED ON ON-DEVICE DATA ANALYSIS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM THEREFOR | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE MESSAGE SUR LA BASE D'UNE ANALYSE DE DONNÉES SUR LE DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ASSOCIÉ | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1225529 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [I]EP1452988 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | KR20070109329 | KR20120034907 |