EP3026109 - IMPROVED PRODUCTION OF GLYCOPROTEINS USING MANGANESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC, TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROWELL, Christopher K. 1061 Wildwood Ave Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
GRAMPP, Gustavo 8329 Pawnee Lane Niwot, CO 80503 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
CROWELL, Christopher K. 1836 Mallard Dr. Superior, CO 80027 / US | ||
02 /
GRAMPP, Gustavo 5363 Muirfield Ct. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 15198171.9 | 06.12.2006 | [2016/22] | Priority number, date | US20050748880P | 08.12.2005 Original published format: US 748880 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026109 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3026109 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C07K14/505, C12P21/02, C12N5/10 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/505 (EP,US);
C07K14/575 (US);
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
C12P21/005 (EP,US);
C12N2500/20 (EP,US);
C12N2500/32 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE HERSTELLUNG VON GLYKOPROTEINEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MANGAN | [2016/22] | English: | IMPROVED PRODUCTION OF GLYCOPROTEINS USING MANGANESE | [2016/22] | French: | PRODUCTION AMELIOREE DE GLYCOPROTEINES UTILISANT LE MANGANESE | [2016/22] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.07.2018 | Observations by third parties | 14.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06847508.6 / EP1957630 | Divisional application(s) | EP22159008.6 / EP4155385 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2022
08.12.2022
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2022
08.12.2022
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 21.12.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2006 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | TR | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | IE | 06.12.2022 | LU | 06.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 06.12.2006 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.12.2022 | ||
LU | 06.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.12.2006 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.12.2022 | ||
LU | 06.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.12.2022 | ||
LU | 06.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.12.2022 | ||
LU | 06.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9808934 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 14 * claim 14 *; | [X]EP1085083 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 14-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0029] *; | [X] - KAUFMAN RANDAL J ET AL, "Depletion of manganese within the secretory pathway inhibits O-linked glycosylation in mammalian cells", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 33, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 9813 - 9819, XP002454613 [X] 14-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00199a001 | [DA] - WITSELL D L ET AL, "DIVALENT CATION ACTIVATION OF GALACTOSYLTRANSFERASE IN NATIVE MAMMARY GOLGI VESICLES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 265, no. 26, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15731 - 15737, XP002454614 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * | [ ] - CROWELL CHRISTOPHER K ET AL, "Amino acid and manganese supplementation modulates the glycosylation state of erythropoietin in a CHO culture system", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (200702), vol. 96, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 538 - 549, XP002454615 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21141 | Examination | WO8502610 | US4703008 | WO9505465 | WO0065070 | EP1298217 | WO2005121173 | - Michael H. Rayner ET AL, "A simple and effective method for the removal of trace metal cations from a mammalian culture medium supplemented with 10% fetal calf serum", BioMetals, (19950101), vol. 8, pages 188 - 192, XP055378079 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00143374 | - SHANTHA RAJU T ET AL, "Glycoengineering of Therapeutic Glycoproteins: In Vitro Galactosylation and Sialylation of Glycoproteins with Terminal N-Acetylglucosamine and Galactose Residues", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 40, no. 30, doi:10.1021/BI010475I, ISSN 0006-2960, (20010101), pages 8868 - 8876, (20010706), XP008153602 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi010475i | by applicant | US4667016 | US4703008 | WO9105867 | WO9505465 | US5459031 | WO0024893 | WO0181405 | - KELLEHER; GILMORE, PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, no. 10, pages 4994 - 4999 | - KELLEHER ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2003), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 101 - 111 | - KELLEHER ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 55 - 65 | - COUTO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, no. 1, pages 378 - 382 | - JENSEN; SCHUTZBACH, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 256, no. 24, pages 12899 - 12904 | - SHARMA ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 319 - 25 | - SUGIURA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, no. 16, pages 9501 - 9507 | - WITSELL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, no. 26, pages 15731 - 7 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 33, pages 9813 - 9 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, no. 8, pages 3657 - 3663 | - ASHWELL; HARFORD, ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 531 - 554 | - GOOCHEE ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY., (1991), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1347 - 55 | - DARLING ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, no. 49, pages 14524 - 31 | - ELLIOTT ET AL., EXP HEMATOL., (2004), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 1146 - 55 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, no. 20, pages 7819 - 22 | - ZANETTE ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 275 - 287 | - COTES; BANGHAM, NATURE, (1961), vol. 191, page 1065 | - ELLIOTT ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 37, pages 11237 - 45 | other | WO8502610 | EP0148605 | US4703008 | EP1298217 | WO2005121173 | EP1957630 | - LAI et al., "Structural Characterization of Human Erythropoietin", J. Biol. Chem., (19860305), vol. 261, no. 7, pages 3116 - 3121, XP000857434 | - "Cell Culture Catalogue 2004", BioConcept, (20040000), pages 1 - 82, XP055468535 | Opposition | WO8502610 | US4667016 | US4703008 | EP0513738 | WO9505465 | WO9619573 | EP0428267 | WO9911781 | WO0065070 | WO0181405 | EP1298217 | EP1394179 | WO2005080545 | WO2007045453 | WO2007070315 | EP3026109 | US2016222075 | - ELLIOTT STEVE ET AL, "Enhancement of therapeutic protein in vivo activities through glycoengineering.", Nature Biotechnology, Nature Publishing Group US, New York, New York, (20030401), vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nbt799, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 414 - 421, XP002354911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt799 | - RAJU T SHANTHA ET AL, "Glycoengineering of therapeutic glycoproteins: In vitro galactosylation and sialylation of glycoproteins with terminal N-acetylglucosamine and galactose residues", Biochemistry, (20010731), vol. 40, no. 30, doi:10.1021/bi010475i, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8868 - 8876, XP002461128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi010475i | - KAUFMAN RANDAL J, SWAROOP M, MURTHA-RIEL P, "Depletion of manganese within the secretory pathway inhibits O-linked glycosylation in mammalian cells", Biochemistry, (19940823), vol. 33, no. 33, doi:10.1021/bi00199a001, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 9813 - 9819, XP002454613 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00199a001 | - CROWLEY et al., "Enzymes and Proteins Containing Manganese: An Overview", Metal Ions in Biological Systems, (20000000), vol. 37, pages 209 - 278, XP055335086 | - EGRIE JOAN C, BROWNE JEFFREY K, "Development and characterization of novel erythropoiesis stimulating protein (NESP).", Nephrology Dialysis Transplantation, Oxford university Press, GB, GB , (20010101), vol. 16, no. Supplement 3, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 3 - 13, XP001059695 | - Christopher K. Crowell et al, "Amino acid and manganese supplementation modulates the glycosylation state of erythropoietin in a CHO culture system", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, John Wiley, Hoboken, USA, Hoboken, USA, (20060825), vol. 96, no. 3, doi:10.1002/bit.21141, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 538 - 549, XP071134465 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21141 | - Dulbecco, R. ; Freeman, G., "Plaque production by the polyoma virus", Virology, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL , (19590701), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0042-6822(59)90043-1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 396 - 397, XP023051822 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(59)90043-1 | - RICHARD G. HAM, "CLONAL GROWTH OF MAMMALIAN CELLS IN A CHEMICALLY DEFINED, SYNTHETIC MEDIUM", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, (19650101), vol. 53, doi:10.1073/pnas.53.2.288, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 288 - 293, XP001344705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.53.2.288 | - MACDOUGALL I C, "DARBEPOETIN ALFA: A NEW THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR RENAL ANEMIA", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, Nature Publishing Group, LONDON, GB, GB , (20020501), vol. 61, no. SUPPL. 80, doi:10.1046/j.1523-1755.61.s80.11.x, ISSN 0085-2538, pages S - 55, XP009064043 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.61.s80.11.x | - EGRIE J.C., ET AL., "THE ROLE OF CARBOHYDRATE ON THE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF ERYTHROPOIETIN.", Glycoconjugate Journal, Chapman & Hall, Boston, Boston , (19930815), vol. 10., doi:10.1007/BF01209934, ISSN 0282-0080, page 263., XP000906829 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01209934 | - Finley John W, Monroe Patrick, "Mn Absorption: The use of CAC cells as a ode! of the intestinal epithelia", J. Nutr. Biochem, Elsevier Science Inc, (19970101), vol. 8, pages 92 - 101, XP093023936 | - Michael H. Rayner, Kazuo T. Suzuki, "A simple and effective method for the removal of trace metal cations from a mammalian culture medium supplemented with 10% fetal calf serum", BioMetals, (19950101), vol. 8, doi:10.1007/BF00143374, pages 188 - 192, XP055378079 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00143374 | - Stefan Nahrgang, "INFLUENCE OF CELL-LINE AND PROCESS CONDITIONS ON THE GLYCOSYLATION OF RECOMBINANT PROTEINS", THÈSE NO 2608 (2002), ÉCOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE, (20020101), THÈSE NO 2608 (2002), URL: http://infoscience.epfl.ch/record/33084/files/EPFL_TH2608.pdf, (20150325), XP055179143 | - Anonymous, "Cell Culture Catalogue", Bioconcept AG, (20040101), Bioconcept AG, (20180419), XP055468535 | - Anonymous, "CELL CULTURE CATALOGUE Technical Information Classical Media Special Media Salt Solutions Buffers Reagents Supplements Sera", Bioconcept, (20150101), pages 1 - 117, XP093023946 | - LAI P.-H., ET AL., "STRUCTURAL CHARACTERIZATION OF HUMAN ERYTHROPOIETIN.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US , (19860305), vol. 261., no. 07., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3116 - 3121., XP000857434 | - LING C T, GEY G O, RICHTERS V, "CHEMICALLY CHARACTERIZED CONCENTRATED CORODIES FOR CONTINOUS CELL CULTURE (THE 7C'S CULTRURE MEDIA)", Experimental Cell Research, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL , (19680101), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/0014-4827(68)90489-8, ISSN 0014-4827, pages 469 - 489, XP000990215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(68)90489-8 | - Analysis report of amino acids of BioConcept's ''MAM- PF2'' medium | - Barile Frank A., "Cell Culture Methodology", In Vitro Cytotoxicology, CRC Press, (19940101), pages 16 - 17, XP093024033 | - Jäger Volker, "Serum-free media suitable for upstream and downstream processing", Jäger Volker, Spier R.E, Griffiths J.B., Meignier B., PRODUCTION OF BIOLOGICALS FROM ANIMAL CELLS IN CULTURE, ESACT , (19910101), pages 155 - 166, doi:10.1016/B978-0-7506-1103-9.50041-X, ISBN 978-0-7506-1103-9, XP093024040 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-7506-1103-9.50041-X | - A Burgener, M Butler, "3 Medium Development", CELL CULTURE TECHNOLOGY FOR PHARMACEUTICAL AND CELL-BASED THERAPIES, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (20060101), pages 41 - 79, ISBN 978-0-8247-5334-4, XP055454641 | - Chuck Alice S., Rohini R. Deshpande , Adrian R. Distler, Shane A. Sander, And James E. Seely, "Commercial production of recombinant erythropoietins", Chuck Alice S., Rohini R. Deshpande , Adrian R. Distler, Shane A. Sander, And James E. Seely, G. Molineux, M.A. Foote, S.G. Elliott, Erythropoietins and Erythropoiesis, Birkhäuser, (20030101), pages 133 - 150, XP093024048 | - Behr-Gross M.E., "Collaborative Study for the Establishment of Erythropoietin BRP Batch 2", Pharmeuropa Bio., (20040101), vol. 2004, no. 1, pages 23 - 33, XP093024053 | - Baetz A. L., Hubbert W. T., Graham C. K., "DEVELOPMENTAL CHANGES OF FREE AMINO ACIDS IN BOVINE FETAL FLUIDS WITH GESTATIONAL AGE AND THE INTERRELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE AMINO ACID CONCENTRATIONS IN THE FLUID COMPARTMENTS", Journals of Reproduction & Fertility, BioScientifica Ltd., GB, GB , (19750901), vol. 44, no. 3, doi:10.1530/jrf.0.0440437, ISSN 1470-1626, pages 437 - 444, XP093024055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1530/jrf.0.0440437 | - RECNY M. A., SCOBLE H. A., KIM Y., "STRUCTUAL CHARACTERIZATION OF NATURAL HUMAN URINARY AND RECOMBINANT DNA-DERIVED ERYTHROPOIETIN.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US , (19871215), vol. 362., no. 35., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17156 - 17163., XP002015827 | - Jennifer Dumont et al, "Human cell lines for biopharmaceutical manufacturing: history, status, and future perspectives", Critical Reviews in Biotechnology, CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, US , (20161118), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266, ISSN 0738-8551, pages 1110 - 1122, XP055333163 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/07388551.2015.1084266 |