EP3033940 - AUTONOMOUS WATERING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR POTTED PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot Drones 174-178 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINTO, Guillaume 18 place des Vosges 75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
BIHLER, Vincent c/o Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15198327.7 | 08.12.2015 | [2016/25] | Priority number, date | FR20140062931 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1462931 | [2016/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033940 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033940 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/16, A01G27/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A01G27/003 (EP,CN,US);
A01G27/006 (CN);
A01G27/008 (US);
A01G27/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTONOME BEWÄSSERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR TOPFPFLANZEN | [2016/25] | English: | AUTONOMOUS WATERING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR POTTED PLANTS | [2016/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IRRIGATION AUTONOME, NOTAMMENT POUR PLANTES EN POT | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2015 | AL | 02.08.2017 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | IT | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | MT | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 08.12.2017 | LU | 08.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 08.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 08.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]KR101045740B (RHO HYUNG JIN [KR]) [Y] 1,6,10 * paragraph [0041]; figures 1,3a,4 * [A] 2-5,7-9; | [Y]US8682493 (CAMPBELL JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,10 * figures 5-7 *; | [Y]CN201107957Y (YANG XU [CN]) [Y] 1,6,10 * figure 1 *; | [A]KR20110050280 (KIM HOUNG KYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP5167551B (SUZUKI MASARU) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE202005021093U (KRACHTUS WERNER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | CN201107957Y | KR101045740B |