EP3031512 - HEAT AND MOISTURE EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichholtz, David Hattinger Str. 52 44789 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Badenhop, Thomas Breslauer Str. 12 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Popp, Carsten Vaillant GmbH IR-IP Berghauser Straße 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 15198335.0 | 08.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | DE201410225544 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014225544 | [2016/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031512 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B01D63/06, B01D71/02, B01D71/36, B01D71/38, B01D71/68, F28F3/00, F24F3/147, F28D21/00, F24H3/06 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
F24H3/06 (EP);
B01D71/5222 (US);
B01D53/268 (EP);
B01D71/024 (EP);
B01D71/028 (EP);
B01D71/0281 (US);
B01D71/36 (EP);
B01D71/52 (EP);
F24F3/147 (EP);
F28D21/0005 (EP);
F28D21/0015 (EP);
F28D7/10 (EP);
B01D2253/104 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
B01D2253/202 (EP);
B01D2253/204 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2258/06 (EP);
B01D2323/2189 (EP);
B01D2325/12 (EP);
F24F2003/1435 (EP);
F28F3/005 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRME- UND FEUCHTEÜBERTRAGER | [2016/24] | English: | HEAT AND MOISTURE EXCHANGER | [2016/24] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET ENTHALPIQUE | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9418508 (ATAG VERWARMING BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-6,10-13 * page 7, lines 17-33; figure 3 * * page 16, lines 1-7 *; | [YDA]EP1071914 (BRESHEARS JOHN EDWARD [US]) [YD] 1,2,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0032] - [0035] - [0038] * [A] 6; | [YD]DE10055612 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-6,12,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0028] , [0042] , [0056] , [0063] - [0065] *; | [Y]DE102006031311 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6-9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0017] *; | [XY]US2011169177 (WANG DEXIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012]; figure 3 * [Y] 2-13; | [Y]US2012073791 (DUBOIS DONN [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,10-13 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] *; | [YDA]US2014238235 (LIU WEI [US], et al) [YD] 1-3,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0060] , [0076] , [0099] , [0100] *[A] 6; | [XPA]WO2015104426 (ZEIDLER BERND [DE]) [XP] 1,2 * page 5, lines 6-18; figures 1,2 * * page 11, lines 19-28 * [A] 7-9 | by applicant | EP0661502 | WO9600198 | WO9915262 | WO9915272 | EP1071914 | DE10055612 | US2008034966 | US2012061045 | WO2012167366 | US2014238235 |