EP3032825 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZAWA, Kazuki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15198605.6 | 09.12.2015 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | JP20140252466 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014252466 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032825 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/103 (US);
H04N19/115 (US);
H04N19/146 (US);
H04N7/15 (US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2016/24] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM | [2016/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT LISIBLE SUR ORDINATEUR | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2019 | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/48] | 21.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 06.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014333716 (KITAZAWA KAZUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7,8; | [Y]US2013038676 (TANAKA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0060]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2011279640 (CHOI JAEYOUNG [KR]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0055] - [0059]; figure - *; | [Y]US2002024611 (WATANABE GAKU [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7,8 * paragraphs [0047] , [0053] - [0072] - [0146] , [0151] , [0154]; figures 2-5,14 * | by applicant | JP2009033652 |