EP3041054 - THIN FILM TRANSISTOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Shin-Hyuk 1308-1803, 30, Pangyowon-ro 82beon-gil Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Eun-Hyun 305, 111, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Tae-Young 801-101, 255, Pangyowon-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 15200428.9 | 16.12.2015 | [2016/27] | Priority number, date | KR20140195693 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140195693 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041054 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H01L29/7869 (EP,CN,US);
H01L29/78696 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/134309 (US);
G02F1/1368 (CN,KR,US);
H01L27/1225 (CN);
H01L29/1054 (CN);
H01L29/24 (US);
H01L29/41733 (US);
H01L29/42384 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTOR UND DIESEN BEINHALTENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2016/27] | English: | THIN FILM TRANSISTOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2016/27] | French: | TRANSISTOR À FILM MINCE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008191204 (KIM SUN-IL [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12 * figures 1,2 *[A] 11,13,14; | [XA]US2008296568 (RYU MYUNG-KWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 11,13,14; | [XAI]US2014197408 (TSURUMA YUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12 * figures 1,5 * [A] 11,13,14 [I] 4,9,15 |