EP3182723 - AUDIO SIGNAL DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reifenrath, Christoph In der Aue 33 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 02 /
Huber, Andreas Am Liepoldsacker 50 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
ROTH, Hans Binsenschlauchweg 5 76187 Karlsruhe / DE | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15200450.3 | 16.12.2015 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182723 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, // G10K11/175 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H04R1/1083 (EP,US);
G10K11/17813 (EP,US);
G10K2210/12 (EP);
G10K2210/1282 (EP);
G10K2210/3055 (EP);
H04R2460/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOSIGNALVERTEILUNG | [2017/25] | English: | AUDIO SIGNAL DISTRIBUTION | [2017/25] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005032500 (NASHIF PETER J [US], et al) [A] 7,14* paragraphs [0010] , [0018] - [0022]; figures 1 -2 *; | [XI]US2007242834 (COUTINHO ROY S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0198] , [0222] - [0227]; figures 29 - 31 * [I] 6,7,13,14; | [XI]US2011150233 (GAUTAMA TEMUJIN [BE]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,7,11,13,14; | [I]EP2405670 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0024]; figures 1 - 6 *; | [A]US2012128166 (KIM LAE-HOON [US], et al) [A] 6,13 * paragraphs [0078] , [0086] * |